NY A02474 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-10)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-15 - print number 2474b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-15 - print number 2474b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to collective negotiations by health care providers with certain health care plans in certain counties; applies to health benefit plans that provide benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a health condition, accident or sickness, including an individual, group, blanket or franchise insurance policy or insurance agreement offered by certain enumerated entities.
Title
Enacts provisions relating to collective negotiations by health care providers with certain health care plans in certain counties; applies to health benefit plans that provide benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a health condition, accident or sickness, including an individual, group, blanket or franchise insurance policy or insurance agreement offered by certain enumerated entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Assembly | print number 2474b |
2012-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2012-01-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-05-06 | Assembly | print number 2474a |
2011-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2011-02-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-01-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03186 (Same As) 2012-06-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
S07615 (Same As) 2012-06-07 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
A10678 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - referred to health
S07615 (Same As) 2012-06-07 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
A10678 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - referred to health