NY A02368 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - ordered to third reading rules cal.56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - ordered to third reading rules cal.56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a cause of action by residents of adult facilities to petition for the appointment of a temporary operator of any such facility in violation of the provisions of law, rules and regulations applicable thereto.
Title
Establishes a cause of action by residents of adult facilities to petition for the appointment of a temporary operator of any such facility in violation of the provisions of law, rules and regulations applicable thereto.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.56 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.56 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-02 | Assembly | print number 2368a |
2014-05-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |