NY A02290 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to zone pricing of gasoline.
Title
Relates to zone pricing of gasoline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.247 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.247 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-01-11 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S02124 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION