NY A02124 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on November 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-07 - signed chap.425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on November 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-07 - signed chap.425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the real property tax exemption a veteran may receive on real property purchased with eligible funds from $5,000 to $7,500 of the assessed value of such property.
Title
Increases the real property tax exemption a veteran may receive on real property purchased with eligible funds from $5,000 to $7,500 of the assessed value of such property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-07 | Senate | signed chap.425 |
2014-11-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1663 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S592 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.119 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.119 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-03-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S00592 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2124