NY A02110 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - print number 2110a
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - print number 2110a
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires residential real property managers or any firm employing a property manager, contracting with a property manager or contracting to provide a property manager to file a registration statement with the secretary of state and to be certified from an approved certifying organization.
Title
Requires residential real property managers or any firm employing a property manager, contracting with a property manager or contracting to provide a property manager to file a registration statement with the secretary of state and to be certified from an approved certifying organization.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. James Brennan [D] | Asm. Barbara Clark [D] |
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Rhoda Jacobs [D] | Asm. Catherine Nolan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Assembly | print number 2110a |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S00184 (Same As) 2014-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 184A