NY A02043 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-05 - print number 2043b
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-11-05 - print number 2043b
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases allowable maximum income of persons occupying rental units otherwise eligible for tax abatement in certain cases under provisions applicable to senior citizens' rent increase exemption (SCRIE).
Title
Increases allowable maximum income of persons occupying rental units otherwise eligible for tax abatement in certain cases under provisions applicable to senior citizens' rent increase exemption (SCRIE).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-05 | Assembly | print number 2043b |
2014-11-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to aging |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | print number 2043a |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S00439 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 439A