NY A02042 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-03-10 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to voter pre-registration and education on voter pre-registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to voter pre-registration and education on voter pre-registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-10SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2014-03-10Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-03-10Assemblypassed assembly
2014-01-22Assemblyamended on third reading 2042b
2014-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.112
2014-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2013-06-13SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2013-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2013-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2013-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.179
2013-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.179
2013-06-11Assemblyreported
2013-06-10Assemblyreported referred to rules
2013-06-04Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2013-05-23Assemblyprint number 2042a
2013-05-23Assemblyamend and recommit to election law
2013-01-09Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S01992 (Same As) 2014-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 1992B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback