NY A01987 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.357
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.357
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of children and family services to examine the call history prior to making any determinations to report incidents of child abuse.
Title
Requires the office of children and family services to examine the call history prior to making any determinations to report incidents of child abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.357 |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1667 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5942A |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.535 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.535 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | print number 1987a |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S05942 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1987A