NY A01826 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-28)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - print number 1826d
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - print number 1826d
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "education investment incentives act"; provides credits against income and corporate franchise tax for various qualified education investments including scholarships, education funds and instructional materials.
Title
Establishes the "education investment incentives act"; provides credits against income and corporate franchise tax for various qualified education investments including scholarships, education funds and instructional materials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Assembly | print number 1826d |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | print number 1826c |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | print number 1826b |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | print number 1826a |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |