NY A01785 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to training and education for sustainable wage jobs and traditional and non-traditional employment in public assistance employment programs.
Title
Relates to training and education for sustainable wage jobs and traditional and non-traditional employment in public assistance employment programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-25 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.242 |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01290 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES