NY A01577 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - advanced to third reading cal.791
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - advanced to third reading cal.791
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises procedures regarding the issuance of both retail and special retail liquor licenses for on-premises consumption regarding the posting of certain notices: requires use of certain ink (i.e., pink ink of a neon, luminous or fluorescent variety such as "Day-Glo" ink) in the notice which the applicant must post at the proposed premises giving notice of the filing of the application, and also requires the applicant to post a copy of written notice of the scheduled hearing, and to include therewith a statement of the proposed use and capacity of the proposed premises; and imposes obligation on applicant to make reasonable efforts to insure that both of these posted items remain posted and to re-post these items upon receipt of a written request from the authority.
Title
Revises procedures regarding the issuance of both retail and special retail liquor licenses for on-premises consumption regarding the posting of certain notices: requires use of certain ink (i.e., pink ink of a neon, luminous or fluorescent variety such as "Day-Glo" ink) in the notice which the applicant must post at the proposed premises giving notice of the filing of the application, and also requires the applicant to post a copy of written notice of the scheduled hearing, and to include therewith a statement of the proposed use and capacity of the proposed premises; and imposes obligation on applicant to make reasonable efforts to insure that both of these posted items remain posted and to re-post these items upon receipt of a written request from the authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.791 |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to economic development |