NY A01030 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - advanced to third reading cal.789
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - advanced to third reading cal.789
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a court may require the reexamination of certain drivers, including the administration of a road test, pursuant to section five hundred six of the vehicle and traffic law; provides for the court or the clerk to notify the commissioner of motor vehicles of an order for reexamination; requires for the expense of the reexamination to be the expense of the person required to be examined.
Title
Provides that a court may require the reexamination of certain drivers, including the administration of a road test, pursuant to section five hundred six of the vehicle and traffic law; provides for the court or the clerk to notify the commissioner of motor vehicles of an order for reexamination; requires for the expense of the reexamination to be the expense of the person required to be examined.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.789 |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.239 |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | print number 1030a |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |