NY A00756 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the crime of staging a motor vehicle accident.
Title
Creates the crime of staging a motor vehicle accident.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 756a |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.786 |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |