NY A00649 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - advanced to third reading cal.531
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - advanced to third reading cal.531
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates, in addition to the existing sanction of criminal contempt of court, the remedies of labor law civil penalties and employee's right to bring civil action for unlawful discharge, penalty or discrimination on account of the exercise by an employee of a juror's right to be absent from employment by reason of jury service.
Title
Creates, in addition to the existing sanction of criminal contempt of court, the remedies of labor law civil penalties and employee's right to bring civil action for unlawful discharge, penalty or discrimination on account of the exercise by an employee of a juror's right to be absent from employment by reason of jury service.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] |
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Barbara Lifton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.531 |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.186 |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |