NY A00497 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides treatment for sexually transmitted diseases to minors without a parent's or guardian's consent; provides definition for health care practitioner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides treatment for sexually transmitted diseases to minors without a parent's or guardian's consent; provides definition for health care practitioner.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to health
2013-05-29Assemblyamended on third reading 497a
2013-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.238
2013-04-30Assemblyreported
2013-01-09Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S03134 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback