NY A00239 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-8)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-21 - print number 239a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-21 - print number 239a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of a crime database of all convictions in New York state of animal cruelty, fighting, neglect, abandonment and mistreatment; makes such crime database available to all law enforcement entities, district attorneys, duly incorporated humane societies, societies for the prevention of cruelty to animals, dog or cat protective associations and animal control officers.
Title
Relates to the creation of a crime database of all convictions in New York state of animal cruelty, fighting, neglect, abandonment and mistreatment; makes such crime database available to all law enforcement entities, district attorneys, duly incorporated humane societies, societies for the prevention of cruelty to animals, dog or cat protective associations and animal control officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Assembly | print number 239a |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |