NY A00181 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the construction of certain facilities for the New York city housing authority.
Title
Relates to the construction of certain facilities for the New York city housing authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | signed chap.91 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1466 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4814 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.783 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04814 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A181