NV SB71 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-24 - Chapter 64.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing sentencing of certain criminal offenders and determining eligibility of certain prisoners for parole. (BDR 14-447)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing sentencing of certain criminal offenders and determining eligibility of certain prisoners for parole. (BDR 14-447)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-24SenateChapter 64.
2013-05-23SenateApproved by the Governor.
2013-05-21SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2013-05-18SenateIn Senate. To enrollment.
2013-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate.
2013-05-16AssemblyRead second time.
2013-05-16AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2013-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2013-02-26AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2013-02-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2013-02-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2013-02-25SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-02-21SenateRead second time.
2013-02-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2013-02-04SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2013-01-11SenateFrom printer.
2013-01-09SenatePrefiled. Recommended to be referred to the Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback