NV SB473 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-11 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-11 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the State Administrative Manual. (BDR 18-1128)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the State Administrative Manual. (BDR 18-1128)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | To printer. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 977.) |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |