NV SB123 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 490.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to energy. (BDR 58-106)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to energy. (BDR 58-106)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-11SenateApproved by the Governor. Chapter 490.
2013-06-07SenateEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2013-06-06SenateTo enrollment.
2013-06-03SenateIn Senate.
2013-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 10, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2013-06-02AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-06-02AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2013-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2013-05-23AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2013-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly.
2013-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2013-05-22SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2013-05-21SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 790.) To printer.
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on General File.
2013-05-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-05-09SenateRe-referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
2013-05-09SenateFrom committee: Without recommendation and re-refer to the Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy.
2013-04-23SenateTo committee.
2013-04-23SenateExemption effective.
2013-04-23SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2013-04-23SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2013-04-23SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 576.)
2013-04-23SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2013-04-23SenateFrom committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
2013-04-12SenateNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2013-02-19SenateFrom printer. To committee.
2013-02-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/history.cfm?ID=321
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB123.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB123_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB453.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB453_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB123_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Bills/SB/SB123_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1825&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=123&fldBillname=SB123
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/77th2013/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=2266&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=SB&fldBillNumber=123&fldBillname=SB123

Bill Comments

feedback