NV AB60 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 192.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 192.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes requirements for solicitation of charitable contributions by nonprofit corporations and other charitable organizations. (BDR 7-217)
Title
Establishes requirements for solicitation of charitable contributions by nonprofit corporations and other charitable organizations. (BDR 7-217)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 192. |
2013-05-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 15, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 151.) To printer. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2012-12-27 | Assembly | From printer. |
2012-12-20 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |