NM SJM3 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Basic health program task force
Title
Basic health program task force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] HHC |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Passed Senate (25-16) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |