NM SB61 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed House (50-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 69.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed House (50-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 69.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Affordable housing act changes
Title
Affordable housing act changes
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Passed House (50-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 69. |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-03 | House | [LD 31] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-03 | House | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-05 | House | [LD 13] HGEIC |
2015-02-05 | House | [LD 13] HGEIC and then to House Judiciary |
2015-01-27 | Senate | [LD 6] Passed Senate (35-0) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-23 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-23 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |