NM SB266 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 52] Passed House (67-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.1) Ch. 99.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Architecture multiple source contracts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Architecture multiple source contracts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-15 - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - Senate Final Passages (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-16House[LD 52] Passed House (67-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.1) Ch. 99.
2013-03-16House[LD 52] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Referred to House Judiciary
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-02-26House[LD 31] Referred to House Business & Industry
2013-02-26House[LD 31] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary
2013-02-12Senate[LD 21] Passed Senate (28-10)
2013-02-12Senate[LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-01-31Senate[LD 13] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2013-01-31Senate[LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-01-17Senate[LD 3] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2013-01-17Senate[LD 3] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback