NM SB130 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - [LD 20] Passed House (66-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 1) Ch. 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - [LD 20] Passed House (66-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 1) Ch. 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Service member child custody act
Title
Service member child custody act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | [LD 20] Passed House (66-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 1) Ch. 4. |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |