NM SB111 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency placement of children
Title
Emergency placement of children
Sponsors
Sen. Sander Rue [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | House | [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-21 | House | [LD 24] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |