NM HJR12 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progress, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] SRC/SJC-SRC API.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recall of certain public officers, ca

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recall of certain public officers, ca

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-02 [LD 44] SRC/SJC-SRC API.
2011-03-05 [LD 47] fl/a- PASSED/H (60-5)
2011-03-04 [LD 46] DP/a
2011-02-25 [LD 39] DP/a-HVEC
2011-01-21 [LD 4] HJC/HVEC-HJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback