NM HB97 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

School district liens on certain school buses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School district liens on certain school buses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-14 - House Final Passages (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-12Senate[LD 17] Action postponed indefinitely
2014-02-12Senate[LD 17] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2014-02-12Senate[LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted
2014-02-04Senate[LD 11] Referred to Senate Education
2014-02-04Senate[LD 11] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Judiciary
2014-02-06House[LD 13] Passed House (63-0)
2014-02-06House[LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted
2014-02-06House[LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary
2014-02-06House[LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted
2014-01-23House[LD 3] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works
2014-01-23House[LD 3] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Judiciary
2014-01-21House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback