NM HB39 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 50.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - [LD 48] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 50.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax refunds for senior services
Title
Tax refunds for senior services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | [LD 48] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 50. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Passed House (67-0) |
2015-02-19 | House | [LD 23] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-23 | House | [LD 4] HWMC |
2015-01-23 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to HWMC and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2015-01-23 | House | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to HWMC |
2015-01-20 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |