NM HB33 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Enrolled on February 12 2014 - 75% progress
Action: 2014-02-12 - [LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 35.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Judicial retirement changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial retirement changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-18 - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-12Senate[LD 17] Passed Senate (41-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 35.
2014-02-10Senate[LD 15] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2014-02-04Senate[LD 11] Referred to Senate Finance
2014-02-04Senate[LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted
2014-02-04Senate[LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2014-02-04Senate[LD 11] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance
2014-02-06House[LD 13] Passed House (64-1)
2014-02-06House[LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2014-02-06House[LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted
2014-02-04House[LD 11] Referred to House Judiciary
2014-02-04House[LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted
2014-01-23House[LD 3] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs
2014-01-23House[LD 3] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary
2014-01-23House[LD 3] Printed
2014-01-23House[LD 3] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2014-01-21House[LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business
2014-01-21House[LD 1] Not Printed
2014-01-21House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback