NM HB224 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Data breach notification act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Data breach notification act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-17 - House Final Passages (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-10Senate[LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
2014-02-10Senate[LD 15] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2014-02-06House[LD 13] Passed House (60-0)
2014-02-06House[LD 13] fl and then to sub adptd
2014-02-06House[LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2014-02-06House[LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted
2014-02-04House[LD 11] Referred to House Judiciary
2014-02-04House[LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted
2014-01-28House[LD 6] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs
2014-01-28House[LD 6] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback