NJ SR105 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Merriam-Webster, Inc. and the Oxford University Press to include word upstander in dictionary.
Title
Urges Merriam-Webster, Inc. and the Oxford University Press to include word upstander in dictionary.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (Voice) |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR226 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/SR105 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/SR/105_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR105 |