NJ SJR60 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, JR-6.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, JR-6.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates October of each year as "Linemen Appreciation Month."
Title
Designates October of each year as "Linemen Appreciation Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Ajr83 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For Ajr83 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For Ajr83 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, JR-6. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR83 |
2014-12-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2014-10-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR83 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by SJR60