NJ SJR25 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR38
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "New Jersey State Commission on Urban Violence."
Title
Establishes the "New Jersey State Commission on Urban Violence."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR25 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
AJR52 (Same As) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
AJR52 (Same As) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee