NJ SCR84 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Concurrent Resolution Placed on
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Constitution to dedicate four percent of CBT revenues to open space, farmland, and historic preservation, water programs, public and private site remediation, and underground storage tank programs, ends current dedication of four percent of CBT revenues for various environmental programs, and increases dedication to six percent of CBT revenues in 2019; and dedicates revenue from leases and conveyances of State-owned open space, farmland, and historic preservation.*
Title
Amends Constitution to dedicate four percent of CBT revenues to open space, farmland, and historic preservation, water programs, public and private site remediation, and underground storage tank programs, ends current dedication of four percent of CBT revenues for various environmental programs, and increases dedication to six percent of CBT revenues in 2019; and dedicates revenue from leases and conveyances of State-owned open space, farmland, and historic preservation.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Suspend Rule 20:2 (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Suspend Rule 20:2 (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Suspend Rule 20:2 (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR130 (Same As) 2014-03-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/SCR84 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/SCR/84_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR84 |