NJ S876 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 7 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-08-07 - Approved P.L.2012, c.32.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits liquor licensees to employ certain ex-offenders in certain positions without a special permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits liquor licensees to employ certain ex-offenders in certain positions without a special permit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly Substitute For A2301 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-07AssemblyApproved P.L.2012, c.32.
2012-06-21AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-7-0)
2012-06-21AssemblySubstituted for A2301
2012-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2012-02-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
2012-02-13SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2012-02-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2012-01-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2301 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - Substituted by S876

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback