NJ S854 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on December 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-09 - Approved P.L.2015, C.168.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on December 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-09 - Approved P.L.2015, C.168.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that certain health care facilities be generator ready; allows health care facilities to qualify for NJEDA loans for cost of generators.
Title
Requires that certain health care facilities be generator ready; allows health care facilities to qualify for NJEDA loans for cost of generators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1341 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1341 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1341 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1341 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, C.168. |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-0-0) |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (40-0) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-2) |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Substituted for A1341 |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-1) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1341 (Same As) 2014-12-15 - Substituted by S854