NJ S788 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Vetoed on July 26 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-07-26 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supplemental appropriation to DHSS for $7,453,000 for family planning services, and requires filing of State Plan Amendment to extend Medicaid coverage for family planning services to persons with incomes up to 200% of federal poverty level.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental appropriation to DHSS for $7,453,000 for family planning services, and requires filing of State Plan Amendment to extend Medicaid coverage for family planning services to persons with incomes up to 200% of federal poverty level.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-25 - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly Substitute For A3204 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-26SenateAbsolute Veto, Received in the Senate
2012-06-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-31-0)
2012-06-25AssemblySubstituted for A3204
2012-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2012-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (27-11)
2012-06-21SenateSenate Amendment (26-0) (Weinberg)
2012-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-06-14SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2012-01-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3149 (Same As) 2012-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3204 (Same As) 2012-06-25 - Substituted by S788 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback