NJ S579 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S762
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes creation of stormwater utilities for certain local government entities.
Title
Authorizes creation of stormwater utilities for certain local government entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-21 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-21 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-15) |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S579 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1583 (Same As) 2015-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1583 (Same As) 2015-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading