NJ S3190 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1729
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Streptomyces griseus as New Jersey State Microbe.*
Title
Designates Streptomyces griseus as New Jersey State Microbe.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3190 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4900 (Same As) 2017-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4900 (Same As) 2017-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee