NJ S307 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S687
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Substituted by A2268 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Substituted by A2268 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes State Transportation Infrastructure Bank within New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust.
Title
Establishes State Transportation Infrastructure Bank within New Jersey Environmental Infrastructure Trust.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A2268 (1R) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment (28-0) (Gordon) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S307 (Carry Over) 2014-06-30 - Substituted by A2268 (1R)
A2268 (Same As) 2014-09-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A2268 (Same As) 2014-09-11 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly