NJ S3027 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.223.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for development and implementation of State trauma system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for development and implementation of State trauma system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-13 - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly Substitute For A4500 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-17AssemblyApproved P.L.2013, c.223.
2014-01-13AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2014-01-13AssemblySubstituted for A4500 (1R)
2014-01-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2014-01-13SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2014-01-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2013-12-12SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2013-12-12SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2013-11-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4500 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S3027 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback