NJ S295 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-20 - Substituted by A444 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-20 - Substituted by A444 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Disqualifies member of board of education for conviction of certain crimes and requires member to undergo criminal history background investigation.
Title
Disqualifies member of board of education for conviction of certain crimes and requires member to undergo criminal history background investigation.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Barbara Buono [D] |
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-20 | Substituted by A444 (1R) | |
2010-10-14 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A444 (Same As) 2011-05-26 - Approved P.L.2011, c.72.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S295 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S0500/295_I1.HTM |