NJ S2825 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Vetoed on July 29 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-07-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes FY 2013 supplemental appropriation to DOH for $7,453,000 for family planning services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes FY 2013 supplemental appropriation to DOH for $7,453,000 for family planning services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-20 - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly Substitute For A4172 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-29SenateAbsolute Veto, Received in the Senate
2013-06-20AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-29-1)
2013-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A4172
2013-06-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2013-06-20SenatePassed by the Senate (25-14)
2013-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2013-06-06SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2013-05-30SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4172 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - Substituted by S2825

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback