NJ S2814 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits adoptees and certain others to obtain adoptee's original birth certificate and other related information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits adoptees and certain others to obtain adoptee's original birth certificate and other related information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-20 - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2013-06-20SenatePassed by the Senate (30-8)
2013-06-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2013-05-30SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3280 (Same As) 2012-09-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A4253 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback