NJ S2715 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Approved P.L.2013, c.146.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Approved P.L.2013, c.146.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOE to prepare and distribute informational pamphlets on how parents can limit a child's exposure to media violence.
Title
Requires DOE to prepare and distribute informational pamphlets on how parents can limit a child's exposure to media violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Sean Kean [R] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4094 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4094 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.146. |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-4) |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A4094 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4094 (Same As) 2013-06-24 - Substituted by S2715