NJ S2499 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A3228 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A3228 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires sober living homes and other substance abuse aftercare treatment facilities to provide certain notifications to next-of-kin when patient is released from care; designated as "Nick Rohdes' Law." *
Title
Requires sober living homes and other substance abuse aftercare treatment facilities to provide certain notifications to next-of-kin when patient is released from care; designated as "Nick Rohdes' Law." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-07 | Senate | Substituted by A3228 (2R) |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3228 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.284.