NJ S2495 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S374
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.236.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.236.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes State-chartered banks, savings banks, savings and loans, and credit unions to conduct certain savings account promotions.
Title
Authorizes State-chartered banks, savings banks, savings and loans, and credit unions to conduct certain savings account promotions.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3868 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3868 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.236. |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-0-0) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A3868 (1R) |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jasey) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2495 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.236.
A3868 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S2495 (1R)
A3868 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S2495 (1R)