NJ S2434 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved P.L.2015, c.44.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved P.L.2015, c.44.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stipulates that retail motor fuel dealers shall not be responsible for certain fees associated with credit, debit and rewards cards.
Title
Stipulates that retail motor fuel dealers shall not be responsible for certain fees associated with credit, debit and rewards cards.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] |
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1985 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1985 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1985 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.44. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-2) |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A1985 |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1985 (Same As) 2015-02-23 - Substituted by S2434