NJ S2427 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-16 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-16 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises penalties for certain drunk driving offenses, including mandating installation of ignition interlock device, and creates restricted use driver's license.*
Title
Revises penalties for certain drunk driving offenses, including mandating installation of ignition interlock device, and creates restricted use driver's license.*
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-2) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3835 (Same As) 2013-12-16 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee